AR HR1040 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Congratulate Lakeside Middle School As A "high-achieving Overall School" And As Recipient Of An Arkansas School Recognition Program Award.
Title
To Congratulate Lakeside Middle School As A "high-achieving Overall School" And As Recipient Of An Arkansas School Recognition Program Award.
Sponsors
Rep. John Vines [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2015-03-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-09 | House | Reassigned and transfer to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-06 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1040 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/HR1040.pdf |