AR HR1027 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Designating March 11, 2015, As "stars Of Life Day" And Recognizing The Accomplishments Of Certain Emergency Medical Services Professionals.
Title
Designating March 11, 2015, As "stars Of Life Day" And Recognizing The Accomplishments Of Certain Emergency Medical Services Professionals.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Baltz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2015-03-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-04 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-03 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1027 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/HR1027.pdf |