AR HR1021 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Recognize The Contributions Of Homeschooling And To Proclaim February 21, 2023, As Homeschool Day At The Arkansas State Capitol.
Title
To Recognize The Contributions Of Homeschooling And To Proclaim February 21, 2023, As Homeschool Day At The Arkansas State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2023-02-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-02-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hr1021&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R |
Text | https://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHR1021.pdf |