AR HR1014 | 2018 | 91st General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing February 2018 As Self-care Month.
Title
Recognizing February 2018 As Self-care Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2018-02-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2018-02-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT |
2018-02-21 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2018F/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1014 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2018F/Bills/HR1014.pdf |