AR HR1008 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-14 - Resolution received unanimous support.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-14 - Resolution received unanimous support.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Honor The Camden Fairview Cardinal High School Football Team For Their 2012 Undefeated Season, Conference Championship, And State Championship.
Title
To Honor The Camden Fairview Cardinal High School Football Team For Their 2012 Undefeated Season, Conference Championship, And State Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | House | Resolution received unanimous support. |
2013-02-14 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2013-02-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-07 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-02-05 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1008 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HR1008.pdf |