AR HJR1008 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Reviewed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution To Amend The Process For The Submission And Approval Of Proposed Initiated Acts, Constitutional Amendments, And Referenda.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution To Amend The Process For The Submission And Approval Of Proposed Initiated Acts, Constitutional Amendments, And Referenda.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - Resolution read and concurred in. (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 64 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseReviewed by the Governor
2019-04-09HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-08HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-08HouseReturned From Senate concurred in.
2019-04-08SenateReturned To the House as concurred in.
2019-04-08SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2019-04-05SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-04-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-04-04SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-04HouseRead and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-03HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-14HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-14HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-14HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-11HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-11HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-11HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback