AR HCR1012 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Encourage The Governor To Submit A State Plan Amendment To The Centers For Medicare And Medicaid Services To Provide Access To Coverage For Migrant Children And Pregnant Women From The Compact Of Free Association Islands.
Title
To Encourage The Governor To Submit A State Plan Amendment To The Centers For Medicare And Medicaid Services To Provide Access To Coverage For Migrant Children And Pregnant Women From The Compact Of Free Association Islands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2017-03-16 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-16 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-13 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HCR1012 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HCR1012.pdf |