AR HCR1009 | 2012 | 88th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - House Died in Senate Sine Die Adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - House Died in Senate Sine Die Adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize The Introduction Of A Nonappropriation Bill To Repeal Acts 2011, No. 1058, That Exempted From The Sales And Use Tax The Gross Receipts Derived From The Sale Of Certain Trucks And Semitrailers.
Title
To Authorize The Introduction Of A Nonappropriation Bill To Repeal Acts 2011, No. 1058, That Exempted From The Sales And Use Tax The Gross Receipts Derived From The Sale Of Certain Trucks And Semitrailers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - Senate - Motion to Suspend the Rules to consider HCR 1009 failed to pass (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | House Died in Senate Sine Die Adjournment. | |
2012-03-09 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2012-03-09 | Senate Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Motion to Suspend the Rules to consider HCR 1009 failed to pass | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2012-02-16 | House Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2012-02-14 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2012-02-13 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES | |
2012-02-13 | House Filed |