AR HCR1007 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Providing That The House Of Representatives And The Senate Of The Ninety-second General Assembly May Recess On Wednesday, March 20, 2019, And Reconvene On Monday, March 25, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing That The House Of Representatives And The Senate Of The Ninety-second General Assembly May Recess On Wednesday, March 20, 2019, And Reconvene On Monday, March 25, 2019.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-04HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-04HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-04SenateReturned To the House as concurred in.
2019-03-04SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2019-02-25SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-02-25SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-25HouseRead and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-21HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback