AR HCR1007 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - House Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - House Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
For A Study Of Lignite And The Funding Of Lignite Research.
Title
For A Study Of Lignite And The Funding Of Lignite Research.
Sponsors
Rep. Garry Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | House Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-04 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-04-01 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-04-01 | House Returned From Senate concurred in. | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Returned To the House as concurred in. | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Resolution read and concurred in. | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-09 | House Resolution received unanimous support. | |
2011-03-09 | House Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-08 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-02 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT | |
2011-03-02 | House Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HCR1007 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Bills/HCR1007.pdf |