AR HCR1003 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-14 - House Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-14 - House Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging The Use Of The Permanent Subcommittees Of The Standing Committees Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate To Study Specific Problems In Lieu Of Creating Task Forces For That Purpose.
Title
Encouraging The Use Of The Permanent Subcommittees Of The Standing Committees Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate To Study Specific Problems In Lieu Of Creating Task Forces For That Purpose.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-14 | House Approved by the Governor | |
2011-02-08 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-02-07 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-02-07 | House Returned From Senate concurred in. | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Returned To the House as concurred in. | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Resolution read and concurred in. | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-01-27 | House Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-01-26 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-01-10 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Select Committee on Rules | |
2010-12-09 | House Prefiled |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HCR1003 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Bills/HCR1003.pdf |