AR HCR1001 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-14 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

For A Joint Session Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate At 10:30 A.m., Tuesday, January 13, 2015, To Declare Election Results, To Administer The Oath Of Office, And To Hear An Address By The Governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

For A Joint Session Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate At 10:30 A.m., Tuesday, January 13, 2015, To Declare Election Results, To Administer The Oath Of Office, And To Hear An Address By The Governor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-14HouseApproved by the Governor
2015-01-13HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2015-01-12HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2015-01-12HouseReturned From Senate concurred in.
2015-01-12SenateReturned To the House as concurred in.
2015-01-12SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2015-01-12SenateRules suspended.
2015-01-12SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2015-01-12SenateReceived from the House.
2015-01-12HouseRead the first time, Rules suspended, Read the second time, Rules suspended, Read the third time. Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate
2015-01-08HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback