AR HB2248 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that HB2248 is now Act 1031
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that HB2248 is now Act 1031
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Implied Consent Law In Relation To The Offense Of Driving Or Boating While Intoxicated.
Title
To Amend The Implied Consent Law In Relation To The Offense Of Driving Or Boating While Intoxicated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Notification that HB2248 is now Act 1031 |
2017-03-31 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-30 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-15 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-07 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |