AR HB2240 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that HB2240 is now Act 1020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Exempt Direct Primary Care Agreements From Insurance Regulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Exempt Direct Primary Care Agreements From Insurance Regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07HouseNotification that HB2240 is now Act 1020
2017-03-31HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-03-30HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-03-30HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2017-03-30SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2017-03-30SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-29SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-03-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
2017-03-20SenateReceived from the House.
2017-03-17HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-03-15HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-03-07HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback