AR HB2233 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that HB2233 is now Act 1517
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend The Arkansas Revenue Stabilization Law Of Arkansas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Arkansas Revenue Stabilization Law Of Arkansas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23HouseNotification that HB2233 is now Act 1517
2013-04-23HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2013-04-23HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2013-04-23HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2013-04-23SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2013-04-23SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-23SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-23SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-23SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-22SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2013-04-22SenateReceived from the House.
2013-04-22HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-22HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-19HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-19HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-19HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-04-19HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2013-03-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2013-03-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback