AR HB2228 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Independent Investigation Of Deaths Involving A Police Officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Independent Investigation Of Deaths Involving A Police Officer.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01HouseDied in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
2017-03-13HouseIn accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2017-03-10HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-10HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-10HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-03-07HouseIn accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback