AR HB2211 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that HB2211 is now Act 1085
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that HB2211 is now Act 1085
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Transportation Of Agricultural Products.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Transportation Of Agricultural Products.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Gray [D] | Rep. Logan Jett [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Notification that HB2211 is now Act 1085 |
2017-04-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-04-03 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-04-03 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2017-04-03 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2017-04-03 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2017-03-29 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-22 | House | Reassigned and transfer to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2017-03-22 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2017-03-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-07 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |