AR HB2211 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that HB2211 is now Act 1225
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that HB2211 is now Act 1225
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning The Naming Of Public Buildings, Structures, Or Facilities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Naming Of Public Buildings, Structures, Or Facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. John Burris [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Notification that HB2211 is now Act 1225 |
2013-04-11 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-10 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |