AR HB2104 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that HB2104 is now Act 993
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Rights Of Incarcerated Parents And The Termination Of Parental Rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Rights Of Incarcerated Parents And The Termination Of Parental Rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07HouseNotification that HB2104 is now Act 993
2017-03-31HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-03-30HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-03-30HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2017-03-30SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2017-03-30SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-29SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-03-22SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-22SenateReceived from the House.
2017-03-22HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-03-21HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-21HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-21HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-03-20HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2017-03-15HouseIn accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2017-03-14HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-14HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-14HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-03-07HouseIn accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback