AR HB2065 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Require State Agencies And Certain State-supported Entities To Submit To Its Board A Monthly Financial Report.
Title
To Require State Agencies And Certain State-supported Entities To Submit To Its Board A Monthly Financial Report.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in the House at Sine Die |
2017-04-03 | House | Return from Governor's office as requested |
2017-03-28 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-27 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |