AR HB2050 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - House Notification that HB2050 is now Act 1184
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - House Notification that HB2050 is now Act 1184
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Admission Standards For State-supported Institutions Of Higher Education; And For Other Purposes.
Title
Concerning Admission Standards For State-supported Institutions Of Higher Education; And For Other Purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | House Notification that HB2050 is now Act 1184 | |
2011-04-01 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-31 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-31 | House Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. | |
2011-03-31 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 | |
2011-03-29 | House Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-29 | House Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Returned To the House as passed as amended. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-28 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-24 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-23 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-23 | House Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-23 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-22 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3 | |
2011-03-21 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-21 | House Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-21 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-17 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-17 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-17 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-07 | House Filed |