AR HB2015 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Recognize The Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact.
Title
To Recognize The Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Baltz [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-04-03 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2017-04-03 | House | The vote by which HB2015 Passed was expunged. |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned From the Senate as requested. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned To the House as requested. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-14 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-06 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |