AR HB2011 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that HB2011 is now Act 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that HB2011 is now Act 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016; And To Establish Certain Security And Safety Requirements For Cultivation Facilities Licensed In This State.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016; And To Establish Certain Security And Safety Requirements For Cultivation Facilities Licensed In This State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Notification that HB2011 is now Act 1100 |
2017-04-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-31 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-16 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2017-03-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-06 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |