AR HB1985 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1985 is now Act 1073
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Promote Water Resource Conservation And Development; And To Amend The Water Resource Conservation And Development Incentives Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Promote Water Resource Conservation And Development; And To Amend The Water Resource Conservation And Development Incentives Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseNotification that HB1985 is now Act 1073
2019-04-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-09HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-09HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-09SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2019-04-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-08SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-04-08SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-04-08SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-08HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-04-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2019-04-04HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback