AR HB1983 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - House Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Create The Healthcare Freedom Of Conscience Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Create The Healthcare Freedom Of Conscience Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-27 House Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2011-03-28 House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2011-03-28 House Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2011-03-28 House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2011-03-09 House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2011-03-09 House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2011-03-09 House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2011-03-07 House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2011-03-07 House Filed

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback