AR HB1980 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Notification that HB1980 is now Act 911
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Notification that HB1980 is now Act 911
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
The National Motto, "in God We Trust", Display Act.
Title
The National Motto, "in God We Trust", Display Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Dotson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Notification that HB1980 is now Act 911 |
2017-03-30 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-29 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-15 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-06 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |