AR HB1965 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1965 is now Act 1066
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1965 is now Act 1066
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Arkansas Delta Music Trail Act; To Promote Tourism And Provide Tax Incentives For Art Projects Along Designated Music Highways In The State; And To Require Signage Along Designated Music Highways In The State.
Title
To Create The Arkansas Delta Music Trail Act; To Promote Tourism And Provide Tax Incentives For Art Projects Along Designated Music Highways In The State; And To Require Signage Along Designated Music Highways In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Notification that HB1965 is now Act 1066 |
2019-04-10 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-09 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-04-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-03-29 | House | Filed |