AR HB1963 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Production Contract Arbitration Procedure Act; And To Provide An Arbitration Process For Disputes Between Growers And Contractors Relating To A Production Contract.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Production Contract Arbitration Procedure Act; And To Provide An Arbitration Process For Disputes Between Growers And Contractors Relating To A Production Contract.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22HouseDied in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
2015-04-22SenateSine Die adjournment
2015-04-22SenateDied in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2015-03-23SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development
2015-03-23SenateReceived from the House.
2015-03-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-03-19HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-19HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2015-03-19HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2015-03-18HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2015-03-13HouseRe-referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2015-03-13HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-13HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2015-03-13HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2015-03-11HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-03-10HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2015-03-09HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback