AR HB1933 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning Medical Release Of An Inmate From The Department Of Correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning Medical Release Of An Inmate From The Department Of Correction.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22HouseDied in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2015-03-17HouseIn accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2015-03-17HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-17HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2015-03-17HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2015-03-10HouseIn accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
2015-03-09HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback