AR HB1912 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - House Notification that HB1912 is now Act 831
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - House Notification that HB1912 is now Act 831
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Extend The Tax Credit For The Rehabilitation Of Historic Structures Located In Arkansas.
Title
To Extend The Tax Credit For The Rehabilitation Of Historic Structures Located In Arkansas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | House Notification that HB1912 is now Act 831 | |
2011-03-29 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-29 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-29 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-09 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-08 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-04 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE | |
2011-03-04 | House Filed |