AR HB1911 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in Hosue Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in Hosue Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Application Of The Income Tax Credit For Waste Reduction, Reuse, Or Recycling Equipment Used For Wood And Wood Fiber.
Title
To Clarify The Application Of The Income Tax Credit For Waste Reduction, Reuse, Or Recycling Equipment Used For Wood And Wood Fiber.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in Hosue Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2017-03-15 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2017-03-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-06 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1911 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HB1911.pdf |