AR HB1907 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning The Academic Facilities Partnership Program.
Title
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning The Academic Facilities Partnership Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |