AR HB1896 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1896 is now Act 1479
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1896 is now Act 1479
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Public Schools, Institutions Of Higher Education, And Remediation; And To Require The Department Of Education And The Department Of Higher Education To Study And Report On Remediation Issues.
Title
Concerning Public Schools, Institutions Of Higher Education, And Remediation; And To Require The Department Of Education And The Department Of Higher Education To Study And Report On Remediation Issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Notification that HB1896 is now Act 1479 |
2013-04-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-18 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-16 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-16 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3 |
2013-04-12 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-12 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-09 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |