AR HB1884 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that HB1884 is now Act 1075
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Governing A County's Obligations Regarding The Production Of Electronic Public Records In Bulk On Request.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Governing A County's Obligations Regarding The Production Of Electronic Public Records In Bulk On Request.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseNotification that HB1884 is now Act 1075
2021-04-28HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-27HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-27HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2021-04-26HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2021-04-22HouseRe-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-04-22HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2021-04-22SenateReturned to the House as passed, as amended, Amendment #1.
2021-04-22SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-22SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-22SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-04-22SenateRules suspended.
2021-04-22SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2021-04-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-04-14SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-14HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-12HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-04-07HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-04-07HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hb1884&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1884/HB1884040720211043.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1884/HB1884042220211424.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=1075.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1884-S1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1884&rcs=2827&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1884&rcs=3080&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1884&rcs=3141&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback