AR HB1799 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Notification that HB1799 is now Act 851
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Arkansas Data Centers Act Of 2023; And To Clarify The Regulation Of The Digital Asset Mining Business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Arkansas Data Centers Act Of 2023; And To Clarify The Regulation Of The Digital Asset Mining Business.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-07 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-13HouseNotification that HB1799 is now Act 851
2023-04-07HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-04-07HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-04-07HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2023-04-07HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2023-04-06HouseRe-referred to the Committee on ADVANCED COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - HOUSE
2023-04-06HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2023-04-06SenateReturned to the House as passed, as amended # 1
2023-04-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-04-06SenateRules suspended.
2023-04-06SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-04-06SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2023-04-06SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-04-06SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2023-04-05SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-04-04SenateReceived from the House.
2023-04-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-04-03HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-03-30HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ADVANCED COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - HOUSE
2023-03-30HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1799&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1799.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1799%2FHB1799040620231741.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=851.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1799-S1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1799&rcs=907&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1799&rcs=1125&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1799&rcs=1183&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback