AR HB1797 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1797 is now Act 1470
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1797 is now Act 1470
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Laws Relating To Municipal Sewage Systems.
Title
To Amend The Laws Relating To Municipal Sewage Systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Notification that HB1797 is now Act 1470 |
2013-04-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-19 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-15 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |