AR HB1784 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Notification that HB1784 is now Act 578
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Notification that HB1784 is now Act 578
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Issuance Of Special License Plates; To Authorize The Issuance And Renewal Of A Grand Lodge Of Arkansas And A Prince Hall Grand Lodge Of Arkansas Special License Plate.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Issuance Of Special License Plates; To Authorize The Issuance And Renewal Of A Grand Lodge Of Arkansas And A Prince Hall Grand Lodge Of Arkansas Special License Plate.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Rye [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Notification that HB1784 is now Act 578 |
2019-03-26 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-25 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-25 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-13 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2019-03-11 | House | Filed |