AR HB1780 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Notification that HB1780 is now Act 759
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Notification that HB1780 is now Act 759
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Laws Concerning Medication Assistive Persons; And To Allow Education Programs For Licensed Practical Nurses In Certain Facilities.
Title
To Amend The Laws Concerning Medication Assistive Persons; And To Allow Education Programs For Licensed Practical Nurses In Certain Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Notification that HB1780 is now Act 759 |
2021-04-15 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-14 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-14 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-05 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-05 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-05 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-03-17 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-17 | House | Filed |