AR HB1763 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Notification that HB1763 is now Act 706
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Notification that HB1763 is now Act 706
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Regarding Arkansas Distilleries; To Authorize Self-distribution; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Law Regarding Arkansas Distilleries; To Authorize Self-distribution; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Emergency Clause Adopted (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Emergency Roll Call passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 12 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Emergency Roll Call passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 12 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Notification that HB1763 is now Act 706 |
2021-04-13 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-12 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call on the Emergency Clause. Emergency Clause was adopted. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote by which the Emergency Clause failed to pass. Motion passed. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-05 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-01 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3 |
2021-03-29 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-29 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-29 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-16 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2021-03-16 | House | Filed |