AR HB1763 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish A Cause Of Action Against Third Parties Who Conduct Background Checks And Release Erroneous Information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish A Cause Of Action Against Third Parties Who Conduct Background Checks And Release Erroneous Information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 65 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17SenateSine Die adjournment
2013-05-17SenateDied in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2013-04-10SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2013-04-10SenateReceived from the House.
2013-04-10HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-04HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-04HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-04HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-04-02HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2013-03-07HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-03-07HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback