AR HB1742 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that HB1742 is now Act 986
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning A Civil Action Involving A Deceptive Trade Practice; And To Define The Measure Of Damages In A Case Involving A Deceptive Trade Practice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning A Civil Action Involving A Deceptive Trade Practice; And To Define The Measure Of Damages In A Case Involving A Deceptive Trade Practice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 53 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 50 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Rep. Farrer made a motion to reconsider HB1742 passed (Y: 56 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 38 N: 41 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07HouseNotification that HB1742 is now Act 986
2017-03-31HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-03-30HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-03-30HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2017-03-30SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2017-03-30SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-28SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-03-22SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
2017-03-22SenateWithdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
2017-03-21SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-21SenateReceived from the House.
2017-03-21HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-03-20HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-20HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-20HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-03-17HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2017-03-15HouseRe-referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2017-03-15HouseThe vote by which HB1742 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2017-03-14HouseRead the third time and failed.
2017-03-14HouseRep. Farrer made a motion to reconsider HB1742 passed
2017-03-13HouseRead the third time and failed.
2017-03-09HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-09HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-09HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-03-08HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2017-03-01HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2017-02-28HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback