AR HB1646 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Notification that HB1646 is now Act 508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Notification that HB1646 is now Act 508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Offense Of Unlawful Use Of An Unmanned Aircraft System; To Amend The Definitions Of "critical Infrastructure" And "unmanned Aircraft System".
Title
Concerning The Offense Of Unlawful Use Of An Unmanned Aircraft System; To Amend The Definitions Of "critical Infrastructure" And "unmanned Aircraft System".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Notification that HB1646 is now Act 508 |
2019-03-14 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-13 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |