AR HB1611 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Notification that HB1611 is now Act 665
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Notification that HB1611 is now Act 665
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Adopt The Uniform Protected Series Act.
Title
To Adopt The Uniform Protected Series Act.
Sponsors
Rep. John Maddox [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Notification that HB1611 is now Act 665 |
2019-04-02 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-01 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-01 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |