AR HB1608 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Notification that HB1608 is now Act 744
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Notification that HB1608 is now Act 744
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Accountability System Developed By The State Of Arkansas Under The Every Student Succeeds Act.
Title
Concerning The Accountability System Developed By The State Of Arkansas Under The Every Student Succeeds Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Notification that HB1608 is now Act 744 |
2017-03-27 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-23 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-23 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2017-02-24 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-24 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |