AR HB1600 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Notification that HB1600 is now Act 603
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Notification that HB1600 is now Act 603
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Consider An Individual Who Earns A Teaching License Upon The Successful Completion Of An Alternative Educator Preparation Program An Eligible Applicant Under The State Teacher Education Program.
Title
To Consider An Individual Who Earns A Teaching License Upon The Successful Completion Of An Alternative Educator Preparation Program An Eligible Applicant Under The State Teacher Education Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Notification that HB1600 is now Act 603 |
2019-03-27 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-26 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-06 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-06 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-05 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-02-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |