AR HB1572 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Notification that HB1572 is now Act 658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Notification that HB1572 is now Act 658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning State Agency Capital Improvement Contracts For Purposes Of Uniformity.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning State Agency Capital Improvement Contracts For Purposes Of Uniformity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Notification that HB1572 is now Act 658 |
2019-03-29 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-28 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |