AR HB1568 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish The Arkansas Advisory Council Of Healthcare Professions Within The Department Of Health.
Title
To Establish The Arkansas Advisory Council Of Healthcare Professions Within The Department Of Health.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-03-26 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-03-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-25 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-02-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |