AR HB1562 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Notification that HB1562 is now Act 619
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Notification that HB1562 is now Act 619
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Autonomous Vehicles.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Autonomous Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Notification that HB1562 is now Act 619 |
2021-04-06 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-05 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-05 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-08 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-08 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-08 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |