AR HB1560 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Notification that HB1560 is now Act 789
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Notification that HB1560 is now Act 789
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Removal Or Immobilization Of Unattended Or Abandoned Vehicles.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Removal Or Immobilization Of Unattended Or Abandoned Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Notification that HB1560 is now Act 789 |
2021-04-16 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-15 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-15 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |