AR HB1551 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Notification that HB1551 is now Act 1243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Notification that HB1551 is now Act 1243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Exemptions Of Prohibited Activities Associated With Nonhuman Primates.
Title
To Amend The Exemptions Of Prohibited Activities Associated With Nonhuman Primates.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Douglas [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 10 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 10 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Notification that HB1551 is now Act 1243 |
2015-04-02 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-04-01 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2015-03-02 | House | Filed |